Trustees LEICESTER SOUTH FOODBANK

Charity number: 1166104
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Dundas Chair 11 July 2019
None on record
Patricia Kendall Trustee 08 August 2022
None on record
John Nicholas Simon Trustee 27 June 2022
None on record
Christopher Batty Trustee 07 June 2022
None on record
Nicola Jane Zamblera Trustee 23 June 2020
None on record
Rakesh Veja Trustee 11 July 2019
None on record
GEOFF ADAMS Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record