Trustees DERBYSHIRE PARENT CARER VOICE
Charity number: 1168641
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cyrilene Cullen | Chair | 29 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Claire Elliott | Trustee | 12 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Wainwright-Hicks | Trustee | 25 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Pauk | Trustee | 30 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Stevenson | Trustee | 20 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
MRS SHEPHERD | Trustee | 15 July 2016 |
|
|||||
TRACEY GREEN | Trustee | 15 July 2016 |
|
|||||
MRS CHEUNG | Trustee | 15 July 2016 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.