FRIENDS OF BURY MUSIC CENTRE

Charity number: 507538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 13 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 11 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 11 January 2020 195 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 19 October 2018 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 30 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required