THE ARTS SOCIETY KINGSTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Under the KDFAS' Young Arts scheme, the society has wholly or partly funded a variety of projects involving local schools and one with a young offenders? institution. The Society also donated funds to a local charity which works with children undergoing cancer treatment in hospital so that they could buy art materials. The amounts involved were ?1,363 (2015); ?1,237 (2014); and ?550 (2013).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Kingston Upon Thames
Governance
- 11 July 2016: Standard registration
- KDFAS (Working name)
- KINGSTON-UPON-THAMES DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS SOCIETY (Previous name)
- KINGSTON-UPON-THAMES DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS SOCIETY (Previous name)
- THE ARTS SOCIETY KINGSTON (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barbara Turner | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Wood | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Avril Horner | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Maria Ortiz | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robin Linnecar | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE LEY | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAUL JARMAN | Trustee | 27 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANNE BEAUMONT | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.25k | £11.66k | £7.10k | £8.63k | £11.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.51k | £9.00k | £8.75k | £10.58k | £13.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 25 June 2024 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 06 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 10 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 13 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 SEP 2015 AS AMENDED ON 27 JUN 2016 AS AMENDED ON 19 JUN 2017
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF THE AESTHETIC EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, THE CULTIVATION, APPRECIATION AND STUDY OF THE DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS AND THE GIVING OF AID TO THE PRESERVATION OF OUR NATIONAL ARTISTIC HERITAGE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Rodney Road
New Malden
KT3 5AB
- Phone:
- 07807505082
- Email:
- dwallsop@talktalk.net
- Website:
-
theartssocietykingston.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window