Financial history OHOLEI YOSEF YITZCHOK LUBAVITCH SCHOOLS

Charity number: 1168395
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £155.55k £252.04k £260.93k £206.23k £236.53k
Total expenditure £161.41k £216.89k £220.90k £175.09k £210.59k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £41.77k £42.91k £40.36k £24.74k £66.16k