Financial history PEUT-ETRE THEATRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1167647
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £143.25k £47.46k £113.12k £83.30k £224.41k
Total expenditure £161.29k £74.54k £112.76k £32.19k £144.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £52.36k £27.73k N/A £3.43k N/A