Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST DAVID'S SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1166070
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £5.93k £54 £5.85k £0 £0
Total expenditure £6.62k £2.60k £5.56k £488 £1.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A