SIBES AND SLED DOGS HUSKY WELFARE LIMITED

Charity number: 1167029
Charity reporting is up to date (55 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 25 May 2021 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 25 May 2021 55 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 14 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 14 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 13 August 2019 135 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 22 July 2019 113 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 26 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 February 2018 On time Download