WILMSLOW SYMPHONY ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY

Charity Number: 507565
Charity reporting is up to date (70 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides the public at the Evans Hall, Wilmslow, with a series of full symphony orchestra concerts.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Total income: £19,618
Total expenditure: £18,457

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 June 1978: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • WILMSLOW SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SALLY WILTSHIRE Chair 21 October 2016
None on record
Tracey Lakin Trustee 26 October 2023
None on record
Huw Hughes Trustee 21 October 2022
None on record
Dr STEPHEN WELLS Trustee 22 October 2021
THE BOLTON MEDICAL INSTITUTE LIMITED
Received: On time
Patricia Quirk Trustee 15 November 2013
None on record
Christine Jagger Trustee 07 May 2012
THE ALDERLEY EDGE SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA
Received: On time
ALASTAIR ROBERTS Trustee 05 April 2011
None on record
FIONA HUGHES Trustee
None on record
JENNY JOHNSON Trustee
None on record
GEOFF THOMASON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £20.65k £13.84k £6.04k £14.59k £19.62k
Total expenditure £18.88k £13.16k £2.76k £18.37k £18.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 09 August 2024 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 24 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 09 February 2023 254 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 15 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 26 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
54 PINGATE LANE
CHEADLE HULME
CHEADLE
SK8 7LT
Phone:
01614858898