Trustees THE GATHERING - CARDIFF
Charity number: 1168154

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev DELYTH ANGHARAD LIDDELL | Chair | 27 March 2016 |
|
|||||
Rebecca Bennett-Wilding | Trustee | 16 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Jane Peters | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alison Myfanwy Lintern-Gittens | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Frederick John Till | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Geraint Owen | Trustee | 03 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Samuel David Johnston | Trustee | 16 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr NICI LINTERN-GITTENS | Trustee | 27 March 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.