Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WINKFIELD, CRANBOURNE AND CHAVEY DOWN

Charity number: 1165536
Charity reporting is up to date (134 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 March 2022 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 14 March 2022 134 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 January 2021 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 January 2021 88 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 January 2020 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 14 January 2020 75 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 February 2019 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 27 February 2019 119 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window