Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WINKFIELD, CRANBOURNE AND CHAVEY DOWN

Charity number: 1165536
Charity reporting is up to date (134 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £92.25k £115.85k £109.08k £154.87k £140.26k
Total expenditure £108.72k £103.41k £146.10k £164.07k £134.41k
Income from government contracts £500 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A