Financial history AIDAN'S ACTIVITY FUND

Charity number: 1166688
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2018 01/04/2019 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022
Total gross income £4.80k £310 £461 £314 £372
Total expenditure £825 £2.39k £436 £1.06k £430
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A