Accounts and annual returns CONSERVE AFRICA

Charity number: 1169258
Charity reporting is overdue by 136 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 136 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 136 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 January 2021 351 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 January 2021 351 days late Download Open in new window