Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ROUNDHAY ST. JOHN'S CHURCH

Charity number: 1165879
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £7.96k £3.94k £4.54k £2.68k £2.45k
Total expenditure £3.74k £3.14k £970 £1.14k £2.16k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A