Chester-Le-Street United

Charity number: 1165984
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 31 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 31 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 02 April 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

02 April 2020 2 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 18 June 2019 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 18 June 2019 79 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 20 April 2018 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 10 March 2018 On time Download