SOUTH WARWICKSHIRE HOSPITAL BROADCASTING ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 507582
Charity reporting is up to date

Governing document

Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.

CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 APRIL 1978 AS AMENDED 11 APRIL 1975, 7 OCTOBER 1999, 18TH OCTOBER 2005 AND 7 JULY 2009

Charitable objects

TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, INFIRMITY AND OLD AGE AMONGST PERSONS LIVING IN THE SOUTH WARWICKSHIRE AREA BY PROVIDING A LOCAL BROADCASTING SERVICE FOR HOSPITALS, OLD PEOPLES HOMES AND SIMILAR INSTITUTIONS.

Area of benefit

The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.

SOUTH WARWICKSHIRE