Accounts and annual returns ALNOURE ACADEMY

Charity number: 1168582
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 30 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 20 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 20 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 19 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 19 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 25 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

25 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window