Trustees UK-MED

Charity number: 1166956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Marian Mathias Trustee 25 February 2022
REACH BWINDI
Received: On time
Cathryn Nerys Rhiannon Turton Trustee 25 February 2022
None on record
Dr Imogen Freya Dawn Stephens Trustee 25 February 2022
None on record
Dr Suzanne Marie Candy Trustee 25 February 2022
None on record
Jenny Christine Appleton Buckle Trustee 19 March 2021
None on record
Louise Parnell Trustee 01 October 2019
None on record
Dr Harpreet Singh Kohli Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Orla Fee Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
PROFESSOR ANTHONY DAMIEN REDMOND OBE Trustee 05 May 2016
None on record