Accounts and annual returns LONDON HINDU AIKYAVEDI

Charity number: 1169499
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 July 2023 161 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 July 2023 526 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 July 2023 891 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 11 July 2023 1257 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1993 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1993 days