Financial history TWO RIDINGS COMMUNITY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1166471
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.21m £1.25m £1.99m £4.11m £2.21m
Total expenditure £1.24m £1.31m £1.57m £3.40m £2.70m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £769.45k £306.41k £325.02k £431.05k £803.39k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.74m £413.98k £865.78k £901.41k £2.85m
Income - Other trading activities £7.63k £25.64k £30.29k £1.61k £13.40k
Income - Charitable activities £897.61k £940.04k £1.35m £3.14m £1.63m
Income - Endowments £1.57m £265.30k £413.88k £76.61k £2.47m
Income - Investment £126.10k £131.81k £159.97k £148.18k £181.05k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.16m £1.23m £1.47m £3.29m £2.58m
Expenditure - Raising funds £74.43k £78.49k £105.18k £104.58k £117.47k
Expenditure - Governance £14.03k £14.24k £15.29k £18.77k £19.91k
Expenditure - Grants institution £913.16k £1.07m £998.69k £2.96m £2.12m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £24.42k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0