Trustees EREWASH INDOOR BOWLS CENTRE
Charity number: 1165757
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAYMOND GEORGE COWELL | Chair | 30 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Robert Nigel Guyler | Trustee | 28 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Brian Thomas | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Potter | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Fryatt | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Norma Alene Hazzledine | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANN HEWITT | Trustee | 30 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN OLIVE JORDAN-SMITH | Trustee | 30 December 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.