HELP IN THE COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1166505
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 15 December 2017 On time Download