UMM SALAMA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity has applied to UK AID DIRECT grants for 2018-2019.two projects working in partnership with local NGO IN Northern Somalia.in Hargeisa..One of this project will improve digital skills and communites in need to encourage venurable people in our society to fully benefit online basic skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Somalia
Governance
- 30 March 2016: CIO registration
- Horn of Africa Disability and Elderly Network (Working name)
- UMA SALAMA FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FOWZI ABDI | Chair | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Iser Hussein | Trustee | 19 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
mohammed elmi | Trustee | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £251 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £251 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 February 2025 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 March 2025 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 August 2024 | 202 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 March 2025 | 402 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 April 2023 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 April 2023 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 May 2022 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 May 2022 | 94 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 August 2021 | 184 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1566 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 30 MAR 2016 AMENDED ON 01 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
1)THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG DISABLED PEOPLE AND ORPHANS WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY IN SOMALIA AS A RESULT OF BEING DISABLED AND AS AN ORPHAN BY; A) PROVIDING EDUCATION AND INFORMATION TO SUPPORT AND ENABLE ORPHANS TO MAXIMISE EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES FOR THEMSELVES. B) RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES AFFECTING DISABLED PEOPLE AND ORPHANS BOTH GENERALLY AND IN RELATION TO THEIR SOCIAL EXCLUSION. 2] FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN NEED IN SOMALIA WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF CONFLICT OR NATURAL DISASTER, TROUBLE OR CATASTROPHE IN PARTICULAR BY THE SUPPLY OF MEDICAL AND EDUCATIONAL AID TO SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
MAIN NAME AMENDMENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
FLAT 34
PELICAN HOUSE
92 PECKHAM ROAD
LONDON
SE15 5PY
- Phone:
- 07930161956
- Email:
- fowziabdi@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window