Accounts and annual returns ACCRINGTON THEATRE GROUP

Charity number: 507611
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 30 December 2024 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 14 August 2024 230 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 10 January 2023 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 19 January 2022 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 05 January 2021 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required