ACCRINGTON THEATRE GROUP

Charity number: 507611
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £11.11k £17.19k £4.13k £14.48k £9.00k
Total expenditure £14.19k £17.21k £1.72k £15.65k £8.35k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A