Accounts and annual returns THE MUSIQUE-CORDIALE TRUST

Charity number: 1167732
Charity reporting is overdue by 263 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2022 Overdue Overdue by 263 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Overdue Overdue by 263 days
Annual return 30 November 2021 20 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 20 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2020 30 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 30 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 30 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 30 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2018 26 November 2019 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 26 November 2019 57 days late Download Open in new window