Trustees SUFFOLK ACCIDENT RESCUE SERVICE

Charity number: 1168764
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Whatling Chair 18 November 2017
THE SUFFOLK ACCIDENT RESCUE SERVICE
Overdue by 114 days
Dr Patricia Mills Trustee 16 December 2020
None on record
Michael Caddock Trustee 16 December 2020
None on record
ANNE DAULTREY Trustee 14 October 2020
None on record
MIKE HILD Trustee 20 November 2019
THE SUFFOLK ACCIDENT RESCUE SERVICE
Overdue by 114 days
Paul William Hockey Trustee 18 September 2019
None on record
DR KAROL SILOVSKY MB CHB Trustee 17 January 2018
THE SUFFOLK ACCIDENT RESCUE SERVICE
Overdue by 114 days
HAROLD RICHARDSON Trustee 18 November 2017
THE SUFFOLK ACCIDENT RESCUE SERVICE
Overdue by 114 days
MR TIM DANIELS Trustee 18 November 2017
None on record