Financial history WHITE GOLD CORNWALL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1169622
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £133.54k £173.90k £232.01k £174.90k £168.00k
Total expenditure £80.33k £179.47k £229.35k £143.30k £175.00k
Income from government contracts £13.35k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A