Financial history CARR LODGE ACADEMY PTA

Charity number: 1165919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 26/01/2018 26/01/2019 26/01/2020 26/01/2021 26/01/2022
Total gross income £9.62k £8.79k £8.22k £4.80k £4.23k
Total expenditure £4.63k £4.58k £3.48k £850 £565
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A