Accounts and annual returns ALL4SCIENCE

Charity number: 1169710
Charity reporting is overdue by 1133 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 37 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 37 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 402 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 402 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 767 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 767 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1133 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1133 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window