Accounts and annual returns HIGHEST PRAISE PRAYER CENTRE

Charity number: 1165737
Charity reporting is overdue by 1065 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 335 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 335 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 700 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 700 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1065 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1065 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 March 2020 145 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 24 March 2020 145 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 March 2019 130 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 10 March 2019 130 days late Download Open in new window