WILDWOOD CHURCH STAFFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Works with Newfrontier Christ Central Churches and Stafford Churches. Provides Sunday Services in Barnfields School including Worship and Bible Teaching and childrens groups. The Gateway Building houses the church offices administration and youth Leaders. It also provides rooms for Youth groups and Drop-in activities for the elderly, and other users such as Chinese language classes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Staffordshire
- Liberia
Governance
- 23 September 2016: Standard registration
- 13 October 2020: Funds received from 515346 WILDWOOD CHURCH
- WILDWOOD CHURCH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eva Fossdal | Chair | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Gould | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Glenn Forsyth Wood | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Burns Millar | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARKUS JOHANNES WEBER | Trustee | 23 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM JOHN RUSSELL | Trustee | 23 September 2016 |
|
|||||
JANE MARIE RUSSELL | Trustee | 23 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £191.31k | £199.26k | £190.45k | £171.62k | £183.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £201.67k | £168.75k | £181.74k | £200.13k | £234.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.62k | £18.77k | £3.20k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 21 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 21 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 10 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2022
(These accounts |
14 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 FEB 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC ('THE OBJECTS'): 4.1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; 4.2 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; AND 4.3 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gateway
2 Wildwood Gate
Wildwood
STAFFORD
ST17 4SB
- Phone:
- 01785665062
- Email:
- admin@wildwoodchurch.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window