AL NOOR CHARITABLE SOCIETY UK

Charity number: 1167705
Charity reporting is up to date (241 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 27 December 2021 241 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 27 December 2021 241 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 12 May 2021 377 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 May 2021 377 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 16 July 2019 77 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 16 July 2019 77 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 04 May 2018 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 26 June 2018 57 days late Download