Accounts and annual returns THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD - LIVING GRACE CHAPEL LIMITED

Charity number: 1168025
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 10 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 10 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 21 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 01 August 2020 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 29 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 12 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required