Financial history THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD - LIVING GRACE CHAPEL LIMITED

Charity number: 1168025
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £20.76k £19.79k £22.73k £20.12k £31.12k
Total expenditure £21.79k £18.13k £18.15k £16.73k £17.52k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A