Governing document THE GWENT BADGER GROUP
Charity number: 507651
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 JULY 1974 AS AMENDED 26 JANUARY 1978, 24 APRIL 1987, 17 MARCH 1995, 22 MARCH 1996 AND 5 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE STUDY AND CONSERVATION OF BADGERS AND TO UNDERTAKE ANY ACTIVITY WHICH WILL ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION ABOUT BADGERS IN THE COUNTY AND ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
GWENT AND ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.