ANGUISH'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1169461
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 02 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required