ANGUISH'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1169461
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Boyd Taylor Trustee 05 September 2018
ANGUISH'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
MARION ROAD CENTRE TRUST Received: On time
NORWICH CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES Received: On time
NORWICH CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES Received: On time
Cllr Karen Davis Trustee 02 September 2017
ANGUISH'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
MARION ROAD CENTRE TRUST Received: On time
NORWICH CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES Received: On time
NORWICH CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES Received: On time
Laura Elizabeth McCartney-Gray Trustee 01 December 2020
ANGUISH'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
NORWICH CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES Received: On time
MARION ROAD CENTRE TRUST Received: On time
NORWICH CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES Received: On time
PHILIP MARK REDVERS DAVIES Trustee 04 March 2020
NORWICH TOWN CLOSE ESTATE CHARITY Received: On time
NORWICH CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES Received: On time
NORWICH TOWN CLOSE ESTATE Received: On time
ANGUISH'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
MARION ROAD CENTRE TRUST Received: On time
NORWICH CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES Received: On time
Adam Christopher Giles Trustee 01 December 2020
ANGUISH'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
NORWICH CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES Received: On time
MARION ROAD CENTRE TRUST Received: On time
NORWICH CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES Received: On time
Professor Eneida Mioshi Trustee 16 September 2020
NORWICH CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES Received: On time
MARION ROAD CENTRE TRUST Received: On time
NORWICH CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES Received: On time
ANGUISH'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
John Paul Garside Trustee 24 January 2020
ANGUISH'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
MARION ROAD CENTRE TRUST Received: On time
NORWICH CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES Received: On time
NORWICH TOWN CLOSE ESTATE Received: On time
NORWICH CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES Received: On time
NORWICH TOWN CLOSE ESTATE CHARITY Received: On time
NORFOLK AND NORWICH FESTIVAL TRUST Received: On time
DAVID FULLMAN Chair 03 October 2016
THE NORWICH HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST LIMITED Received: On time
ST. EDMUNDS SOCIETY Received: On time
NORWICH CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES Received: On time
NORWICH TOWN CLOSE ESTATE CHARITY Received: On time
CHARITY OF LILIAN ARMITAGE Received: On time
NORWICH TOWN CLOSE ESTATE Received: On time
THEATRE ROYAL (NORWICH) TRUST LIMITED Received: On time
MARION ROAD CENTRE TRUST Received: On time
ANGUISH'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
NORWICH CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES Received: On time
MICHAEL JAMES FLYNN Trustee 03 October 2016
NORWICH CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES Received: On time
THE EASTERN TRANSPORT COLLECTION SOCIETY Received: On time
Vivien Thomas Trustee 01 December 2020
NORWICH TOWN CLOSE ESTATE CHARITY Received: On time
NORWICH TOWN CLOSE ESTATE Received: On time
ANGUISH'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE NORFOLK & NORWICH - EL VIEJO FRIENDSHIP LINK Received: On time
NORWICH CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES Received: On time
MARION ROAD CENTRE TRUST Received: On time
NORWICH CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES Received: On time
Ashley Rohan Ford-McAllister Trustee 29 October 2021 None on record
Sally Ann Button Trustee 01 December 2020
ANGUISH'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
NORWICH CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES Received: On time
MARION ROAD CENTRE TRUST Received: On time
NORWICH CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES Received: On time
Jacqueline Patricia Hanlon Trustee 16 September 2020
NORWICH TOWN CLOSE ESTATE CHARITY Received: On time
NORWICH CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES Received: On time
NORWICH TOWN CLOSE ESTATE Received: On time
NORWICH CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES Received: On time
MARION ROAD CENTRE TRUST Received: On time
ANGUISH'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
JEANNE MARY SOUTHGATE Trustee 03 October 2016
NORWICH TOWN CLOSE ESTATE Received: On time
NORWICH CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES Received: On time