Accounts and annual returns ASPERGER'S CHILDREN AND CARERS TOGETHER

Charity number: 1169099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 05 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 06 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 23 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window