Autistic Children and Carers Together

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ACCT runs a wide range of fun and supportive activity groups for autistic children and young people in Sheffield including regular multi-activity children and teenage groups, football coaching, arts and gaming, with sessions held in-person and online. We also run a social group for young autistic adults, a parent-carer support group and Autism-friendly activities for the whole family.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £57,469 from 1 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 08 September 2016: CIO registration
- ACCT (Working name)
- ASPERGER'S CHILDREN AND CARERS TOGETHER (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HELEN PATRICIA GILDER | Chair | 08 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Janet Himan | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Court | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sara Bartlett Brown | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nadine Cain | Trustee | 27 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Kilner | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £154.47k | £181.04k | £206.14k | £155.30k | £211.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £136.30k | £140.59k | £161.96k | £210.03k | £200.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £45.00k | £52.77k | £52.80k | £52.80k | £57.47k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.53k | £13.70k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 08 Sep 2016 as amended on 14 Feb 2023 as amended on 17 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
The object of the CIO is to support the needs of autistic children and young people living in the Sheffield area, in particular by provision of services and assistance to them and their family and carers, irrespective of political or religious affiliation, race, gender or sexual orientation.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Mary's Community Centre
Bramall Lane
Sheffield
South Yo
- Phone:
- 01142230242
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window