BEAULIEU COMMUNITY TRUST (BCT)

Charity number: 1169335
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £15.00k £1.13k £85.90k £127.49k £86.84k
Total expenditure £290 £1.91k £69.03k £126.32k £116.88k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £15.00k £300 £32.46k £21.29k £57.04k