FROME SYMPHONY

Charity number: 1167989
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 19 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 19 March 2021 262 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 09 December 2019 162 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 25 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required