Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF TOWER ROAD ACADEMY

Charity number: 1166748
Charity reporting is overdue by 638 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 273 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 273 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 638 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 638 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 24 March 2021 267 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 22 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 14 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required