NEWBY AND SCALBY LIBRARY AND INFORMATION CENTRE

Charity number: 1168661
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 06 December 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 13 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 13 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 01 April 2017 06 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 06 January 2018 On time Download