Trustees Accumulate

Charity number: 1170009
Charity reporting is up to date (30 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michelle Sally Chair 14 July 2022
None on record
Katherine Finerty Trustee 26 August 2023
None on record
Crystal Alleyne Trustee 22 October 2020
None on record
Jon Walmsley Dr. Trustee 30 September 2020
None on record
Debra Yudolph Trustee 30 September 2020
None on record
TOM CAMPBELL MA, MSC, Trustee 03 November 2016
None on record
GRAHAM HITCHEN Trustee 03 November 2016
THE SAMOSA MEDIA LIMITED
Overdue by 27 days
JAMES WARD MBA Trustee 03 November 2016
None on record