KNOLE U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education and in particular the education of people not in full time gainful employment who are in their Third Age residing in Sevenoaks and its surrounding locality.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 24 March 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deborah Anne Magness | Chair | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Ellen Williams | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Howard Stapleton Dilley | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Ann Martin | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Victoria Jeanette Oldman | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Kathleen Wickham | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Karolyn Willsher | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bryan Edward Rawlins | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Jean Elizabeth Zariffis | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Clout | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.96k | £5.60k | £6.73k | £8.17k | £10.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.94k | £5.78k | £5.82k | £6.25k | £8.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 April 2022 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 June 2021 | 135 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 FEB 2016 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Redcot
Childsbridge Lane
Seal
SEVENOAKS
Kent
TN15 0BL
- Phone:
- 01732 762715
- Email:
- secretary@knoleu3a.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window