THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD PENTECOST ARENA BIRMINGHAM

Charity number: 1169547
Charity reporting is up to date (24 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 24 May 2021 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 24 May 2021 24 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 22 May 2020 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 22 May 2020 22 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 26 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 26 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 04 September 2018 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 04 September 2018 127 days late Download