Financial history AIM ACHIEVE INSPIRE MOTIVATE

Charity number: 1167767
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £5.41k £6.02k £675 £4.98k £14.46k
Total expenditure £2.42k £3.08k £4.27k £4.21k £7.58k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A