AIM ACHIEVE INSPIRE MOTIVATE

Charity number: 1167767
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

AIM provides free out of school tuition to children from low income families

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £24,031
Total expenditure: £19,478

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 June 2016: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • AIM (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ZOE BISSETT-CATANIA Chair 21 June 2016
None on record
Penelope Norwood Trustee 06 June 2017
None on record
KATHERINE SUSANNE MURPHY Trustee 21 June 2016
None on record
KIMBERLEY ANN SHEPPARD Trustee 21 June 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £4.98k £14.46k £9.91k £17.88k £24.03k
Total expenditure £4.21k £7.58k £7.62k £12.84k £19.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 17 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 21 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 19 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 10 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
47 BROADWATER DOWN
TUNBRIDGE WELLS
TN2 5NY
Phone:
07932740171